Financial history THE IRENE TAYLOR TRUST

Charity number: 1073105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £500.15k £376.23k £414.52k £410.91k £529.28k
Total expenditure £533.49k £355.40k £446.08k £521.29k £505.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £51.70k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £167.46k N/A N/A N/A £213.39k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £331.96k N/A N/A N/A £311.68k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £731 N/A N/A N/A £4.21k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £466.67k N/A N/A N/A £439.93k
Expenditure - Raising funds £66.82k N/A N/A N/A £65.98k
Expenditure - Governance £7.79k N/A N/A N/A £10.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0