Trustees THE IRENE TAYLOR TRUST
Charity Number: 1073105

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Andrew Bates | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Perry Nelson | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ewan Grant | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Zenildo David Pinto Cassoneca | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa-Irene Birungi-Majithia | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Sychta | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Davis | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Taylor | Trustee | 14 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
James Edward Maloney | Trustee | 14 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN HAROLD LESLIE ADAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.