BEDFORD ROAD PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for school by organising social events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 14 May 1999: Standard registration
- 09 February 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- 26 February 2017: Re-registered
- BEDFORD ROAD LOWER SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- BEDFORD ROAD LOWER SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tasnim Bond | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE CATCHPOLE | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.41k | £9.46k | £3.28k | £33 | £1.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.22k | £3.50k | £5.70k | £1.30k | £1.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 FEB 1999 AS AMENDED ON 30 OCT 2002 AS AMENDED ON 03 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE EDUCATION AND WELL BEING OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
KEMPSTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bedford Road Primary School HILLGROUNDS
KEMPSTON
BEDFORD
MK42 8QH
- Phone:
- 01234851011
- Email:
- bedford.road.ptfa@gmail.com
- Website:
-
bedfordroad.school
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window