THE PENRITH AND NORTH LAKES U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing education and short courses for mostly retired or semi retired adults.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
53 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 12 January 1999: Standard registration
- PENRITH AND NORTH LAKES U3A (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Elizabeth Irving | Chair | 17 June 2021 |
|
|||||
James Murdock | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ronnie Lyon | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Elizabeth Wright | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Beale | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Stables | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Denise Marie Walker | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Ann Hall | Trustee | 16 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Josie Dunlop | Trustee | 18 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Maggie Neale | Trustee | 18 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sue Tomlinson | Trustee | 19 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.88k | £6.98k | £13.51k | £16.01k | £18.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.65k | £7.13k | £13.57k | £16.04k | £18.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/04/1997 AS AMENDED ON 05/05/1999 AS AMENDED ON 15/05/2003 AS AMENDED ON 15/02/2007 AS AMENDED ON 19/06/2014 AS AMENDED ON 16 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 16 Jun 2022 as amended on 16 Jun 2022 as amended on 20 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
PENRITH AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Hollies
Wordsworth Street
Penrith
Cumbria
CA11 7QZ
- Phone:
- 01768 892690
- Email:
- pnlu3achair@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window