THE SLYNN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The foundation was established to provide support advice to countries of Europe and other parts of the world. This is done through lectures and seminars to lawyers in these countries, and to create and award fellowships, to help promising young lawyers to spend a period in London gaining .useful practical experience .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
Total income includes £64,691 from 2 government contract(s)
People

18 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
- Albania
- Bahrain
- Eritrea
- Georgia
- Macedonia
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Ukraine
Governance
- 02 December 1998: Standard registration
- LORD SLYNN OF HADLEY EUROPEAN LAW FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Smith | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
The Rt Hon Sir David Bean | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
The Rt Hon Lady Leoona Dorrian | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
The Hon Mrs Justice Lucy Morgan Theis | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
The Hon Mrs Justice Sara Cockerill | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor David Ormerod CBE KC Hon | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roger James Coventry | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
The Rt Hon Vivien Rose DBE PC | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Walter James Wolffe | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Merethe Borge MacLeod | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
His Hon Sir Howard Morrison | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Ann Lindley | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
The Rt Hon Sir Stephen John Irwin | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Phillip Matthew Yallop JP | Trustee | 04 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
The Hon Mrs Justice Maura Patricia McGowan | Trustee | 04 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sir Nicholas John Blake | Trustee | 10 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JOHN LEWIS | Trustee | 19 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Julian Acratopulo | Trustee | 18 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.11k | £5.45k | £61.37k | £75.21k | £116.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.23k | £17.98k | £62.18k | £51.82k | £88.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £60.81k | N/A | £41.68k | £73.91k | £64.69k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/05/1998 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/07/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/08/2011
Charitable objects
(1) THE CENTRAL OBJECT FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED IS TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION AIMED AT IMPROVING JUDICIAL AND LEGAL SYSTEMS IN EUROPE AND IN OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD. THIS CENTRAL OBJECT WILL INCLUDE IN PARTICULAR THE FOLLOWING SPECIFIC OBJECTS: A. THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF EDUCATION AIMED AT ADVANCING THE RULE OF LAW IN ALL ITS ASPECTS AND THE PROTECTION OF HUMAN RIGHTS; B. THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ALL ASPECTS OF EUROPEAN AND HUMAN RIGHTS LAW; AND C. THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ALL FORMS OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION. (2) THE COMPANY MAY ACHIEVE THESE OBJECTS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT, AND IN PARTICULAR: A. WHETHER BY ITSELF OR IN COLLABORATION WITH OTHERS PROMOTING, ORGANISING OR RUNNING CONFERENCES, LECTURES, SEMINARS, TUTORIALS OR OTHER COURSES OF EDUCATION BENEFIT; B. ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF OR PROVIDING FELLOWSHIPS AND SCHOLARSHIPS AIMED AT PROVIDING KNOWLEDGE AND PRACTICAL EXPERIENCE OF THE TOPICS THE FOUNDATION IS CONCERNED TO PROMOTE; C. HOLDING A SLYNN FOUNDATION LECTURE EVERY YEAR; D. ANY OTHER ACTS OR THINGS WHICH ARE INTENDED TO FURTHER THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY OR ARE CONDUCIVE OR INCIDENTAL TO DOING SO.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CLIFFORD CHANCE LLP
10 UPPER BANK STREET
LONDON
E14 5JJ
- Phone:
- 07900167589
- Email:
- slynn-foundation@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window