Trustees THE SLYNN FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1072703
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger James Coventry | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor David Ormerod CBE KC Hon | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
The Rt Hon Vivien Rose DBE PC | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Walter James Wolffe | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Claire Ann Lindley | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Merethe Borge MacLeod | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
His Hon Sir Howard Morrison | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
The Rt Hon Sir Stephen John Irwin | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Phillip Matthew Yallop JP | Trustee | 04 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
The Hon Mrs Justice Maura Patricia McGowan | Trustee | 04 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sir Nicholas John Blake | Trustee | 10 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian Cameron Cliff CMG, OBE | Trustee | 14 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
THE RT HON SIR DAVID LATHAM | Trustee | 29 January 2013 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN JOHN LEWIS | Trustee | 19 January 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.