BARBY TOWN LANDS AND EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Give out grants in the Parish of Barby and Onley
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 30 November 1998: Standard registration
- 09 June 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 18 July 2011: Re-registered
- 27 March 2023: Funds received from 1037947 BARBY PRE - SCHOOL
- TOWN LANDS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ross Middleton | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jo Martin | Trustee | 12 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rob Wilson | Trustee | 30 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
DEREK MIDDLETON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD CAMP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.67k | £14.18k | £13.58k | £13.03k | £16.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.49k | £11.50k | £8.53k | £7.41k | £26.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.18k | £2.08k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 March 2022 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 14TH SEPTEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED ON 15 DECEMBER 2024
Charitable objects
(A) THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN SUCH CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; AND (B) THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING ) OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 WHO OR WHOSE PARENTS ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF BARBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Castle Mound
Barby
RUGBY
CV23 8TN
- Phone:
- 07909680508
- Email:
- catsabine@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window