Accounts and annual returns DIOCESE OF NOTTINGHAM - LOURDES PILGRIMAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1073482
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 04 July 2011 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2009 21 June 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 21 June 2010 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2008 16 July 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 16 July 2009 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2007 29 July 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 29 July 2008 On Time