THE FAMILIES IN BRITISH INDIA SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of advice, service and data to assist researchers of the history and biographical details of ancestors who served in India and South Asia from 1600 to 1947AD.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 November 1998: Standard registration
- 02 February 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 02 February 2009: Funds transferred to 1118885 THE FAMILIES IN BRITISH INDIA SOCIETY
- FIBIS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.04k | £4.61k | £12.60k | £13.42k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.86k | £3.15k | £7.56k | £8.01k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 19 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 19 January 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 19 December 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 19 December 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 29 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 29 December 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 18 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 19 August 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3RD OCTOBER 1998
Charitable objects
(1)TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE PUBLIC STUDY OF FAMILY, SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC HISTORY, GENEALOGY, AND RELATED SUBJECTS SUCH AS LOCAL HISTORY, WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THOSE AREAS WHICH WERE ADMINISTERED OR OF INTEREST TO THE HONOURABLE EAST INDIA COMPANY, AND THOSE AREAS WHICH WERE ADMINISTERED OR OF INTEREST TO THE GOVERNMENT OF INDIA. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE SOCIETY THE AREAS SHALL INCLUDE PAKISTAN, BANGLADESH, BURMA, CEYLON / SRI LANKA. PERSIA AND THE PERSIAN GULF AND ANY OTHER AREAS DEEMED RELEVANT BY THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE; (B) TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION, SECURITY AND ACCESSIBILITY OF ARCHIVAL MATERIAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window