ALL SAINTS' PARISH CHURCH BECKLEY ENDOWMENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance of the Church, Mission and Outreach of All Saints' Parish Church, Beckley, East Sussex
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
Governance
- 12 November 1998: Standard registration
- BECKLEY CHURCH TRUST (Working name)
- Investment
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE REV'D DR BILL DOLMAN JP | Chair | 04 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
KEITH ROBERT FORD | Trustee | 05 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARIE-CLAIRE CONSTANCE ERITH | Trustee | 05 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Guy George Micklethwaite Fillmore | Trustee | 05 November 2011 |
|
|||||
ERIC JOHN AMBROSE EDWARDS | Trustee | 06 July 1998 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA ANNE COLEGRAVE | Trustee | 06 July 1998 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.93k | £6.25k | £6.55k | £6.29k | £250 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.50k | £1.50k | £2.00k | £60 | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 January 2022 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 06/07/1998 AS AFFECTED BY RESOLUTION MADE UNDER S74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 02/02/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13/06/2014
Charitable objects
(1) THE PRESERVATION REPAIR MAINTENANCE IMPROVEMENT UPKEEP BEAUTIFICATION AND RESTORATION OF THE CHURCH AND OF THE CHURCHYARD AND GROUND INCLUDING WHERE APPROPRIATE THE REPLACEMENT OR MAKING OF ADDITIONS TO ANY MONUMENT FITTING FIXTURE STAINED GLASS FURNITURE ORNAMENT ORGAN BELL OR CHATTEL IN THE CHURCH OR THE SAID YARDS OR GROUNDS (11) PAYMENT TOWARDS THE STIPEND OF THE INCUMBENT OR ANY OTHER PRIEST LICENSED TO SERVE IN THE PARISH OF BECKLEY (111) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSE WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCILS (POWERS) MEASURE 1956 AFFECTING THE PARISH OR ANY PART THEREOF; AND (IV) ANY PURPOSE INTENDED TO FURTHER THE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND THE SPIRITUAL MORAL AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE SAID PARISH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BECKLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
FANTAILS
MAIN STREET
BECKLEY
RYE
TN31 6RN
- Phone:
- 01797260256
- Email:
- guyfillmore@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window