GAMBICATS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gambicats monitors the health of stray cats and dogs in the Gambia and provides neutering support. Gambians are given financial help to encourage neutering. Local vets assist all year and an outside vet team visits annually. Feeding programme during rainy season.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- The Gambia
Governance
- 25 March 1999: Standard registration
- 21 April 2023: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 21 April 2023: Funds transferred to 1096814 THE GAMBIA HORSE AND DONKEY TRUST
- GAMBIDOGS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2018 | 28/02/2019 | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.81k | £46.70k | £21.73k | £17.82k | £23.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.53k | £17.01k | £34.02k | £13.49k | £30.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 04 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 OCTOBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION 7 MARCH 1999 as amended on 29 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION, AND IN PARTICULAR, TO ARRANGE FOR THE CARE, NEUTERING AND SPAYING OF FERAL CATS IN THE GAMBIA 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE CARE AND PROTECTION OF ANIMALS
Area of benefit
GAMBIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window