CORBY ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Corby Mind works for a better life for local people with in the borough of Corby with experience of mental distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 12 November 1998: Standard registration
- 26 July 2023: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 26 July 2023: Funds transferred to 1033000 NORTHAMPTONSHIRE MIND
- CORBY MIND (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £190.56k | £137.38k | £243.93k | £170.43k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.25k | £140.08k | £247.31k | £182.11k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £57.64k | £115.06k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.29k | £64.10k | £8.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 July 2023 | 168 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 July 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7TH OCTOBER 1998 as amended on 28 May 2020 as amended on 12 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF MENTAL HEALTH AND TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING AND AND REHABILITATING PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL DISORDER OR CONDITIONS OF EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS REQUIRING ADVICE OR TREATMENT IN CORBY AND DISTRICT IN ASSOCIATION WITH MIND (THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH) AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF MIND.
Area of benefit
CORBY AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window