Trustees BEfriend
Charity number: 1072538

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Macrae | Chair | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sebastian Rama Barnes | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Carl Woodall | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elly Tsung Ting Ng | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Joslin | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Queffurus | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.