THE LANDSCAPE INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To protect, conserve and enhance the natural and built environment for the benefit of the public by promoting the arts and sciences of Landscape Architecture.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,455,463
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.34m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £52.08k | |
Other | £65.25k |
Total expenditure:
£2,711,875
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.71m | |
Other | £0 |
£98,293 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.71m |
People

22 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
800 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 January 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLIN GOHLER FLI | Chair | 01 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Helen Oldfield | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Smeeden CMLI | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Phillips CMLI | Trustee | 10 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Barker AMLI MRTPI | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Noel Farrer FLI | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mathew Haslam CMLI | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Clarke | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|||||
MARC NORDEN | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine House CMLI | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.31m | £2.21m | £2.43m | £2.60m | £2.46m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.47m | £2.35m | £2.51m | £2.91m | £2.71m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.30m | £2.13m | £2.35m | £2.52m | £2.34m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £63.20k | £62.48k | £61.62k | £52.08k | |
|
Income - Other | £16.38k | £19.76k | £20.42k | £18.45k | £65.25k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.47m | £2.35m | £2.51m | £2.91m | £2.71m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £1.75k | £1.93k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £380.81k | £364.48k | £0 | £245.84k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £1.75k | £1.93k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £83.18k | £18.20k | £0 | £1.13k | £222.13k | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.43m | £1.72m | £1.82m | £1.71m | £1.33m | |
|
Other assets | £961.14k | £972.25k | £1.04m | £672.92k | £586.13k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £589.49k | £672.36k | £800.48k | £744.69k | £660.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 1ST SEPTEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED 0N 9 JULY 2008 as amended on 12 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT, CONSERVE AND ENHANCE THE NATURAL AND BUILT ENVIRONMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING THE ARTS AND SCIENCES OF LANDSCAPE ARCHITECTURE (AS SUCH EXPRESSION IS HEREINAFTER DEFINED)AND ITS SEVERAL APPLICATIONS AND FOR THAT PURPOSE TO FOSTER AND ENCOURAGE THE DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE RELATING TO THE LANDSCAPE ARCHITECTURE AND THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH AND EDUCATION THEREIN, AND IN PARTICULAR TO ESTABLISH, UPHOLD AND ADVANCE THE STANDARDS OF EDUCATION, QUALIFICATION, COMPETENCE AND CONDUCT OF THOSE WHO PRACTISE LANDSCAPE ARCHITECTURE AS A PROFESSION AND TO DETERMINE STANDARDS AND CRITERIA FOR EDUCATION TRAINING AND EXPERIENCE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Landscape Institute
85 Tottenham Court Road
LONDON
W1T 4TQ
- Phone:
- 03308082230
- Email:
- mail@landscapeinstitute.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window