JOHN SNOW INTERNATIONAL EUROPE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
Governance
- 05 August 1999: Standard registration
- 29 June 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- JSI EUROPE (Working name)
- JOHN SNOW INTERNATIONAL RESEARCH AND TRAINING ( UK ) (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2004 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.44m | £3.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.43m | £7.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 23 June 2009 | 143 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 23 June 2009 | 509 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 24 June 2009 | 875 days late | |
Annual return | 31 October 2004 | 09 September 2005 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2004 | 28 September 2005 | 28 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27TH OCTOBER 1998, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 8TH JULY 1999
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS ARE TO ADVANCE THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AND, IN PARTICULAR, BY THE CARRYING OUT OF RESEARCH AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window