THE SOUTH ASIAN HEALTH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SAHF holds numerous conferences both at national and local levels for healthcare professionals. In addition, SAHF hosts community meetings for health education and promotion. Members of the SAHF working groups acts as health advocates by representing the South Asian healthcare needs in vasrious organisaitons. Finally, SAHF strives to encourage high quality research and implmentation of evidence
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 January 1999: Standard registration
- THE SOUTH ASIAN HEALTH FOUNDATION (Working name)
- THE INDIA FOUNDATION (U.K.) (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr KIRAN PATEL | Chair | 12 December 1999 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amal Lad | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ranjit Dhillon | Trustee | 07 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vinod Patel | Trustee | 16 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paramjit Gill | Trustee | 16 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
NINA CHAUHAN-LALL | Trustee | 16 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR KAMLESH KHUNTI | Trustee | 16 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amitava Banerjee | Trustee | 16 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr MOHAMED WASIM HANIF | Trustee | 16 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £193.11k | £79.85k | £115.43k | £143.75k | £110.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £152.20k | £44.82k | £109.98k | £127.64k | £111.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH OCTOBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED 5 JANUARY 2004
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE OR ASSIST IN EFFORTS TO RELIEVE PERSONS LIVING IN UK, PARTICULARLY THOSE OF SOUTH ASIAN ORIGIN, WHO ARE EXPERIENCING CONDITIONS OF SICKNESS HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORTING ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHING OR IMPLEMENTING DEVELOPMENTAL OR EDUCATIONAL PROJECTS WHICH SERVE THE NEEDS OF THESE PERSONS AND IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF NEED.
Area of benefit
INDIA OR THE UK
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 WESTFIELD ROAD
EDGBASTON
BIRMINGHAM
B15 3QE
- Phone:
- 07802288182
- Email:
- info@sahf.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window