THE RICHARD DEWING TRUST: EAST RUDHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for church school and church work with young people in the Rudhams.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Norfolk
Governance
- 19 November 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Philip FOX | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
JAYNE CUBITT | Trustee | 05 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.28k | £872 | £1.06k | £1.28k | £1.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £850 | £3.45k | £0 | £500 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 March 2024 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 November 2022 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 16TH AUGUST 1867
Charitable objects
THE PURCHASE OF FUEL TO BE DISTRIBUTED AMONG THE THE AGED INFIRM OR NECESSITOUS INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF EAST RUDHAM AT SUCH TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE VICAR SHOULD IN HIS SOLE DISCRETION THINK FIT AND AS TO THE REMAINDER IN OR TOWARDS PAYMENT OF THE SALARY OR SALARIES OF THE MASTER AND MISTRESS OR OTHERWISE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE NATIONAL SCHOOL FOR THE TIME BEING OF EAST RUDHAM IN SUCH MANNER AS SUCH VICAR SHOULD IN HIS SOLE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
EAST RUDHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE RECTORY
WEST RAYNHAM
FAKENHAM
NR21 7HH
- Phone:
- 01328838385
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window