Financial history THE CRAB AND WINKLE LINE TRUST

Charity number: 1077110
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.31k £1.31k £786 £921 £1.02k
Total expenditure £229 £229 £157 £2.06k £385
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A