MAINSTONE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of the inhabitants of Mainstone and the neighbourhood and to establish and maintain a Community centre for their use.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 15 July 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Sandell | Chair | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Hawk | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Ball | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deputy Lord Mayor Maddi Bridgeman President | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Billingham | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Davd Bees | Trustee | 11 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.12k | £37.33k | £11.75k | £14.81k | £14.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.88k | £19.44k | £11.02k | £11.58k | £16.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £36.00k | £4.14k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 29 April 2024 | 151 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 17 May 2023 | 168 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 04 December 2020 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 MARCH 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MAINSTONE, PLYMOUTH, DEVON (HEREINAFTER CALLED ''THE AREA OF BENEFIT'') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED ''THE CENTRE'') AND TO ESTABLISH MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES.
Area of benefit
MAINSTONE PLYMOUTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mainstone Sports & Social Club
Pattinson Drive
PLYMOUTH
PL6 8RU
- Phone:
- 01752497775
- Email:
- mainstonessc@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window