Financial history ABERYSTWYTH MINI MINORS

Charity Number: 1073200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £23.10k £0 £20.48k £17.32k £21.21k
Total expenditure £26.43k £0 £18.10k £15.70k £16.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A