THE RICHARD D. WRIGHT MEMORIAL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide opportunities so local school & community are able to access/enjoy healthier-more active life styles. Address inequalities, as defined within the Equality Act 2010, through innovative/worthwhile interventions/activities. Providing better life chances through access to training/development. Providing diversionary services to tackle anti-social behaviour and reduction of crime
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 09 August 1999: Standard registration
- 23 June 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1 | £9.77k | £9.77k | £1 | £9.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.53k | £0 | £9.77k | £0 | £10.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 19 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 29 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 JULY 1999
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AT HAMSTEAD HALL SCHOOL BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SPORTS AND RECREATIONAL EQUIPMENT AT THE SCHOOL PROVIDED THAT SUCH PROVISION DOES NOT REPLACE THE STATUTORY OBLIGATIONS OF THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE HANDSWORTH WOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window