ARM - SENEGAL

Charity number: 1073875
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing education, training, healthcare in southern Senegal. Christian church-planting and outreach activities. Relief of poverty through provision of a day centre, education, vocational training and meals for street boys. An orphanage for abandoned babies and plans for a village school. Funding and resourcing a Christian adult training school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019

Total income: £38,888
Total expenditure: £42,708

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire
  • Wiltshire
  • Guinea-bissau
  • Senegal

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 February 1999: Standard registration
  • 07 November 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • AFRICAN REVIVAL MINISTRIES-SENEGAL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £59.89k £38.18k £50.60k £50.92k £38.89k
Total expenditure £72.74k £53.47k £51.89k £51.25k £42.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 January 2018 On Time