Financial history THE VERIFICATION RESEARCH TRAINING AND INFORMATION CENTRE ( VERTIC )

Charity number: 1073051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £1.67m £1.35m £1.37m £1.21m £2.18m
Total expenditure £1.28m £1.35m £1.26m £1.05m £1.48m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £140.02k £127.90k N/A
Income from government grants £45.17k £13.78k £140.02k £127.90k £129.12k
Income - Donations and legacies £19.82k £0 £0 £0 £64.55k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.65m £1.35m £1.37m £0 £2.07m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £5.95k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £20.49k £30.78k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.13m £1.31m £1.08m £866.44k £1.29m
Expenditure - Raising funds £32.37k £37.09k £38.00k £15.69k £20.83k
Expenditure - Governance £44.86k £33.73k £14.30k £12.85k £48.68k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £119.11k £0 £149.25k £163.18k £163.05k