SIGHT CONCERN BEDFORDSHIRE

Charity Number: 1117209
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sight Concern Bedfordshire's aim is to enhance the independence of blind and partially sighted people living within Luton and Bedfordshire. To reach out to the whole community to raise awareness about visual impairment and to ensure that everyone who requires information, and or, assistance receives it.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £312,627
Total expenditure: £329,182

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bedford
  • Central Bedfordshire
  • Luton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 June 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hubert pawelkiewicz Trustee 22 April 2024
None on record
Jamile Paul Little Trustee 15 June 2023
SIGNPOSTS (LUTON)
Received: On time
Calli O'Brien Trustee 11 June 2020
None on record
Adrian Spurrell Trustee 13 December 2018
None on record
Joanna Claire Jameson Trustee 14 June 2016
None on record
DAVID LISTER JOHN MITCHELL Trustee
BEDFORD SHOPMOBILITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £320.09k £325.62k £310.60k £360.25k £312.63k
Total expenditure £392.06k £377.07k £282.19k £307.99k £329.18k
Income from government contracts £54.64k £56.00k N/A £44.42k £44.42k
Income from government grants £133.60k £20.04k £96.19k £126.84k £110.50k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 18 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 18 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 10 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 10 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 14 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 14 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 29 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 29 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 15 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 15 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 29 MARCH 2007 AS AFFECTED BY A UNITING DIRECTION MADE UNDER S.96 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 AND DATED 29 MARCH 2007.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PERSONS RESIDENT IN LUTON AND BEDFORDSHIRE.
Area of benefit
LUTON AND BEDFORDSHIRE.
Registration history
  • 27 June 2007 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
116 Bromham Road
BEDFORD
MK40 2QN
Phone:
01234311555