LIXWM VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ARTS/CULTURE, SPORT, RECREATION, ECONOMIC AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Flintshire
Governance
- 07 February 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ERNIE O'BRIEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JACQUILINE BARBER | Trustee | 05 October 2005 |
|
|
||||
ISOBEL KENDRICK | Trustee | 10 November 1989 |
|
|
||||
ANDY ORHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEFF IRONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LISA ORHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAREDUDD DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAURAINE O'BRIEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NESTA DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7 | £7 | £8 | £8 | £8 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 03 September 2024 | 211 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 June 2023 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 June 2023 | 482 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 02 June 2023 | 847 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 21 DECEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
IS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF: A) A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS, INCLUDING USE FOR: I) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND II) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION; AND B) A RECREATION GROUND FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS. 2) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART 2 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE COMMITTEE FOR USE FOR THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
LIXWM - CDD POLLING DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRYN Y GWYNT
WALWEN
LIXWM
HOLYWELL
CH8 8LU
- Phone:
- 01352 780076
- Email:
- kendrickisobel@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window