Financial history LINGFIELD AND DORMANSLAND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1076628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £87.64k £69.69k £74.44k £77.59k £81.36k
Total expenditure £69.32k £66.29k £67.45k £74.29k £84.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £28.82k £33.76k £2.67k £500 N/A