Financial history HEADLEY VOLUNTARY CARE GROUP

Charity number: 1080589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £7.03k £7.44k £9.99k £13.83k £15.11k
Total expenditure £6.08k £6.51k £7.36k £12.78k £13.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A