THE DUKE OF EDINBURGH'S AWARD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
When young people build lifelong belief in themselves, there are no limits to what they can achieve. That's why, at The Duke of Edinburgh's Award (DofE), we support young people of all backgrounds to take on their own challenges and discover talents the never knew they had. DofE is open to ages 14-24, and runs in schools, youth clubs, hospitals, prisons and more, all over the UK. Visit DofE.org.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£24,268,000
Donations and legacies | £4.07m | |
Charitable activities | £16.90m | |
Other trading activities | £1.43m | |
Investments | £114.00k | |
Other | £1.75m |
Total expenditure:
£24,746,000
Raising funds | £3.26m | |
Charitable activities | £21.49m | |
Other | £0 |
£2,021,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £180,468 from 87 government contract(s) and £2,862,000 from 5 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.26m | |
Charitable expenditure | £21.49m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.26m | |
Charitable expenditure | £21.49m | |
Retained for future use | £1.54m |
People

350 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
39457 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 8 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Baroness Grey-Thompson DBE | Chair | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Polly Williams | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Andrew Shuter | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roisin Helen Currie | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Judith Sophia Watford | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Barker | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED ISAP | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Ofei Kwafo-Akoto | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julian Hough | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mel Ewell | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA TEHAN | Trustee | 09 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
HRH THE EARL OF WESSEX | Trustee | 01 November 1989 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.33m | £14.74m | £20.76m | £22.38m | £24.27m | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.04m | £14.12m | £17.16m | £22.00m | £24.75m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £193.75k | £180.47k | |
|
Income from government grants | £263.00k | £1.09m | £823.00k | £3.00m | £2.86m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £5.71m | £5.51m | £5.52m | £5.07m | £4.07m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £11.94m | £8.93m | £13.26m | £13.86m | £1.43m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £666.00k | £303.00k | £1.98m | £4.40m | £16.90m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.00m | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £22.00k | £3.00k | £2.00k | £7.00k | £114.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £36.00k | £1.75m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.00m | £1.00k | £0 | £15.00k | £5.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £13.47m | £11.65m | £13.72m | £18.87m | £21.49m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.57m | £2.47m | £3.43m | £3.13m | £3.26m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £254.00k | £137.00k | £156.00k | £289.00k | £297.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £618.84k | £1.23m | £2.96m | £2.73m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £114.00k | £135.00k | £120.00k | £171.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.56m | £3.38m | £3.34m | £3.62m | £1.30m | |
|
Long-term investments | £11.71m | £13.82m | £18.00m | £17.61m | £23.96m | |
|
Other assets | £10.02m | £11.30m | £10.89m | £12.44m | £9.33m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.89m | £1.99m | £1.79m | £2.12m | £1.49m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 01 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
TO CONTINUE TO FOSTER AND ADMINISTER, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FUNDAMENTAL PRINCIPLES IN ARTICLE 2(2), A PROGRAMME OF AWARDS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE IN OUR UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE AND THEREBY, THROUGH THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR CHARACTER, TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Linked charities
- 21 April 2008 : Standard registration
- 09 January 2009 : Removed
- 09 January 2009 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Greyfriars Road
Reading
RG11NU
- Phone:
- 01753727400
- Email:
- info@dofe.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window