THE (LEYLAND) SEVEN STARS SCHOOL PARENTS, FRIENDS AND TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hold an annual summer BBQ, Christmas Bingo or Fair, Discos, Easter events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 14 November 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 03 December 1998: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jemma Margaret Jones | Chair | 26 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
LYNN BRETHERTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 14/11/2019 | 14/11/2020 | 14/11/2021 | 14/11/2022 | 14/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.22k | £644 | £809 | £3.93k | £3.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.33k | £697 | £3.25k | £3.46k | £2.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 November 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 November 2022 | 03 October 2023 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 November 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 November 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 November 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 SEPTEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Seven Stars Primary School
Peacock Hall Road
Leyland
PR25 1TD
- Phone:
- 01772422503
- Website:
-
seven-stars.lancngfl.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window