WILTSHIRE HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST

Charity Number: 1075598
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide grants to help towards the preservation, repair and maintenance of the church fabric. Applications are administered by the local archdeaconaries. Trustees and Deanery Reps meet half-yearly to award grants. Funds are raised from investment income, private donations, bequests, church donations, "Ride & Stride" and "Friends of Wiltshire Churches" membership and fund raising.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £114,013
Total expenditure: £220,806

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 May 1999: Standard registration
  • 06 August 2018: Funds received from 261005 THE HARTHAM CHURCH CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HIS HONOUR MARK EVERALL KC Chair 15 December 2011
None on record
Luke March Trustee 14 November 2022
THE SALISBURY CATHEDRAL GIRL CHORISTERS' FUND
Received: On time
WESSEX MEDICAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE WOODFORD VALLEY WITH ARCHERS GATE
Received: On time
THE ASSOCIATION OF THE FRIENDS OF SALISBURY CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
Patrick Wintour Trustee 14 November 2022
None on record
Stephen Lake Rt REv Trustee 31 July 2022
None on record
James Donald Hay Trustee 13 June 2022
None on record
William Hiscocks Trustee 13 June 2022
THE ARDEOLA CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
BRITISH SOCIETY FOR RHEUMATOLOGY
Received: On time
VENERABLE CHRISTOPHER PAUL BRYAN Trustee 08 June 2019
None on record
Rev GRAHAM WARMINGTON Trustee 24 November 2018
None on record
Right Reverend Vivienne Faull Trustee 24 November 2018
None on record
Canon CHARLES WALTER EDWARD RALPH BUCHAN FCA Trustee 13 June 2015
THE TEMPLE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
SARAH ROSE TROUGHTON Trustee 20 February 2012
None on record
BRIAN WOODRUFFE Trustee 12 December 2011
None on record
MICHAEL JEREMY HODGES Trustee 17 September 2011
THE CAMPAIGN TO PROTECT RURAL ENGLAND WILTSHIRE
Received: On time
THE WILTSHIRE HISTORIC BUILDINGS TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF THE ORDINARIATE OF OUR LADY OF WALSINGHAM
Received: On time
THE ASSOCIATION OF BRITISH MEMBERS OF THE SOVEREIGN MILITARY HOSPITALLER ORDER OF ST. JOHN OF JERUSALEM OF RHODES AND OF MALTA
Received: On time
VENERABLE ALAN PAUL JEANS Trustee
ST BONIFACE TRUST
Received: On time
VISCOUNT PORTMAN'S CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SALISBURY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
SOWTER CLERICAL LIBRARY
Received: On time
THE MUSEUM OF THE ROYAL ARMY CHAPLAINS DEPARTMENT CIO
Received: On time
ANNE DOYLE DSG Trustee
MELKSHAM FOODBANK AND LIFELINE CIO
Recently registered
MRS ANNE COOKE Trustee
None on record
NEIL OWEN SKELTON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £107.51k £104.99k £95.85k £98.58k £114.01k
Total expenditure £114.80k £58.94k £97.78k £93.56k £220.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 26 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 15 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Parkside
Rectory Road
Alderbury
SALISBURY
SP5 3AD
Phone:
07715610666