OVERSEAS SRI LANKAN MUSLIM EDUCATIONAL TRUST(OSMET)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATION AND TRAINING - THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO PROVIDE SCHOLARSHIPS AND GRANTS FOR THE NEEDY AND UNDERPRIVILEDGED SRILANKAN MUSLIM STUDENTS FOR HIGHER EDUCATION AT GCE ADVANCED LEVEL AND UNIVERSITY STAGES IN SRI LANKA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 04 December 1998: Standard registration
- OSMET (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Imran ISMAIL | Chair | 21 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nizam Ismail | Trustee | 21 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shabana Ismail | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr FERINA ISMAIL | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
AHAMED SABATHY MARIKAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.84k | £24.12k | £18.33k | £17.72k | £16.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.44k | £334 | £30.21k | £22.00k | £20.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST JANUARY 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SCHOLARSHIPS AND GRANTS TO NEEDY SRI LANKAN MUSLIM STUDENTS WHO ARE EITHER STUDYING AT UNIVERSITY OR STUDYING FOR THE G.C.E. ADVANCED LEVEL EXAMINATIONS IN SRI LANKA.
Area of benefit
SRI LANKA
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 Pangbourne Drive
STANMORE
Middlesex
HA7 4RD
- Phone:
- 07917087846
- Email:
- osmet@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window