HEARTLANDS CYSTIC FIBROSIS CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides a centre of excellence for the medical care of adult patients suffering from cystic fibrosis for the whole of the West Midlands region. The Charity seeks to continually improve the centre for the benefit of patients. It also promotes research into the causes and treatment of cystic fibrosis, provides counselling services and furthers public education about the condition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Derbyshire
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Shropshire
- Solihull
- Staffordshire
- Wolverhampton
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 19 March 1999: Standard registration
- HEARTLANDS CYSTIC FIBROSIS CENTRE APPEAL (Previous name)
- WEST MIDLANDS ADULT CYSTIC FIBROSIS CENTRE CHARITY APPEAL (Previous name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR JOANNA WHITEHOUSE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Louise Rachel Bandy | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Gilday | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Helen Wainwright | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Malcolm Sellers | Trustee | 13 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Neil Patel | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Mary Barrett | Trustee | 15 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID EDWARD STABLEFORTH | Trustee | 04 November 1998 |
|
|||||
JANE ELIZABETH BULL MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.00k | £38.18k | £31.40k | £45.72k | £14.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £177.81k | £43.00k | £38.59k | £31.03k | £46.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 June 2022 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 June 2022 | 149 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 04/11/1998 AS AMENDED ON 03/02/1999 AS AMENDED ON 11/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 08 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES FOR THE RELIEF OF PATIENTS AT THE HEARTLANDS CYSTIC FIBROSIS CENTRE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ward 26 Heartlands Hospital
Bordesley Green East
Bordesley Green
BIRMINGHAM
B9 5SS
- Phone:
- 07973640986
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window