HODDESDON CHRISTMAS PARCELS COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide Christmas parcels and food gifts to elderly people in Hoddesdon and Broxbourne to nominated individuals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 12 August 1999: Standard registration
- H.C.P.S. (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lawrence Bone | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER DAVIDSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.20k | £753 | £750 | £406 | £1.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.01k | £809 | £790 | £1.00k | £1.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH JULY 1999
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG PEOPLE OF PENSIONABLE AGE IN HODDESDON, RYE PARK, BROXBOURNE AND WORMLEY BY THE PROVISION OF PARCELS AND GIFTS.
Area of benefit
HODDESDON, RYE PARK, BROCBOURNE AND WORMLEY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 RIVERSMEAD
HODDESDON
EN11 8DP
- Phone:
- 07803700919
- Email:
- lawrencerbone@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window