WYRE FOREST DIAL-A-RIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a door to door community transport service for the residents of Wyre Forest District, Worcestershire and surrounding Counties who are in need of such a service because of age, sickness or disability (mental or physical) or poverty, or because of a lack of availability of adequate and safe public passenger services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £86,823 from 3 government contract(s) and £17,293 from 5 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 14 June 2005: Standard registration
- DIAL-A-RIDE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Glen Michael Collins | Chair | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Trudi Elliott | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Catherine Foster | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Sarah Beadsworth | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Caldicott | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Simner | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Redfern | Trustee | 26 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan HALEY | Trustee | 17 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.18k | £156.16k | £110.92k | £115.51k | £176.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.26k | £135.73k | £121.88k | £129.68k | £145.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £69.98k | £66.93k | £61.57k | £67.15k | £86.82k | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.20k | £42.79k | £9.29k | £10.27k | £17.29k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 February 2025 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 February 2025 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 February 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 February 2021 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 MAY 2005.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR SUCH OF THE INHABITANTS OF WYRE FOREST AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH SERVICE BECAUSE OF AGE, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY ( MENTAL OR PHYSICAL), OR POVERTY, OR BECAUSE OF A LACK OF AVAILABILITY OF ADEQUATE AND SAFE PUBLIC PASSENGER SERVICES.
Area of benefit
WYRE FOREST AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WFDC Depot
Green Street
Kidderminster
Worcestershire
DY10 1HA
- Phone:
- 01562755084
- Email:
- info@WFDaR.org.uk
- Website:
-
WFDaR.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window