LEWDOWN RECREATION FIELD AND YOUTH SPORTS ACTIVITIES COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of facilities for use by local sports clubs, businesses and local people for sports, cricket, football etc. & recreational use for adults and young people. Provide the use of building, facilities and grounds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 07 January 1999: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN WILLIAM LETHBRIDGE | Chair | 30 May 2011 |
|
|||||
Charlie Hughes | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FREDERIC C JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £250 | £0 | £10.00k | £0 | £970 | |
|
Total expenditure | £89 | £0 | £0 | £10.20k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 September 2024 | 328 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 March 2023 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 March 2023 | 491 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 March 2023 | 856 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH DECEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE A RECREATION GROUND FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF LEWDOWN, CORYTON, MARYSTOWE, LEWTRENCHARD, THRUSHELTON WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
LEWDOWN, CORYTON, MARYSTOWE, LEWTRENCHARD, THRUSHELTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Blue Lion
Lewdown
Okehampton
Devon
EX20 4DL
- Phone:
- 01566783238
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window