Trustees THE CHAPLAINCY, MANCHESTER AIRPORT
Charity Number: 1074781

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Perkes | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Parkash Singh | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|||||||
Jacqueline Herlihy | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Zarda Begum | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Bishop Matthew Porter | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Paula Wainwright | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
RABBI JONATHAN GUTTENTAG | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Major Donald Montgomery | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Supt. Helen Caldbeck | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rad Taylor | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Edmund Kwesi Akyea Mensah | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Radford Taylor | Trustee | 20 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen James Reynolds | Trustee | 12 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Michael John Gannon | Trustee | 25 November 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.