Financial history COSTA BLANCA FERAL CAT TRUST

Charity number: 1074492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 19/03/2020 19/03/2021 19/03/2022 19/03/2023 19/03/2024
Total gross income £2.85k £350 £3.20k £3.97k £4.02k
Total expenditure £2.58k £3.66k £1.75k £3.57k £5.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A