Accounts and annual returns BELLAMY ADVENTURE CLUB

Charity number: 1075450
Charity reporting is overdue by 1470 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 9 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 9 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 374 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 374 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 740 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 740 days
Annual return 30 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1105 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1105 days
Annual return 30 June 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1470 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1470 days