GAINSBOROUGH AND DISTRICT HERITAGE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Recently the association has continued to refurbish and redevelop the 1905 old post office to transform it into a new heritage and research centre. The association also continues to research local history topics, publish books, and hold popular slide shows, talks and social events to raise interest in local history and support the building project and the charities aims.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 23 September 1999: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW BIRKITT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ANNE SPEED | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE AYRIS | Trustee | 16 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.00k | £42.40k | £25.04k | £15.47k | £19.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.30k | £23.13k | £12.38k | £26.29k | £20.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £21.50k | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 November 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/05/1996 AS AMENDED ON 25/09/1997 AS AMENDED ON 18/05/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND IMPROVE INTEREST IN LOCAL HISTORY THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF A HERITAGE MUSEUM BY; A) FURTHERING PUBLIC EDUCATION IN LOCAL HERITAGE. B) PURSUING RESEARCH OF ALL ASSOCIATED HERITAGE MATTERS C) COLLECTING AND RECORDING INFORMATION, DOCUMENTS AND ARTEFACTS RELATING TO LOCAL HERITAGE D) ENCOURAGING PARTICIPATION, COMMUNICATION AND DISCUSSION OF APPROPRIATE SUBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gainsborough Heritage Centre
The Old Post Office
North Street
Gainsborough
Lincolnshire
DN21 2HS
- Phone:
- 01427 610526
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window