Financial history FALKLANDS CONSERVATION

Charity number: 1073859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £708.18k £748.54k £1.15m £1.77m £1.57m
Total expenditure £579.01k £731.54k £1.02m £1.31m £1.32m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £135.84k £246.21k £296.68k £885.35k £621.56k
Income - Donations and legacies £654.45k £711.67k £995.65k £1.48m £1.20m
Income - Other trading activities £30.00k £6.29k £62.95k £109.40k £119.70k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.28k £12.82k £1.01k £23.41k £75.00k
Income - Other £20.45k £17.76k £93.99k £165.99k £181.62k
Income - Legacies £0 £1.00k £1.00k £6.76k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £576.18k £706.94k £994.20k £1.29m £1.29m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.83k £24.60k £25.30k £24.90k £26.76k
Expenditure - Governance £15.11k £14.37k £15.82k £16.41k £21.21k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £377
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0