BUCKINGHAMSHIRE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Buckinghamshire Community Foundation acts as a conduit, connecting the charitable donations of private, business, trust and public sector donors with not for profit community groups and individuals in crisis. We do this through a wide ranging programme of grant making, principally in Buckinghamshire, but with some broader programmes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,817,083
Donations and legacies | £3.19m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £234.65k | |
Investments | £387.82k | |
Other | £4.54k |
Total expenditure:
£2,771,500
Raising funds | £141.48k | |
Charitable activities | £2.63m | |
Other | £0 |
£740,451 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £957,769 from 10 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £141.48k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.63m | |
Retained for future use | £1.05m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £141.48k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.63m | |
Retained for future use | £1.79m |
People

15 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 February 1999: Standard registration
- 09 September 2014: Funds received from 259570 THE BUCKINGHAMSHIRE TERRITORIAL GENERAL PURPOSES F...
- 07 May 2019: Funds received from 1141615 JULIAN BUDD KIDS IN SPORT TRUST LIMITED
- 29 December 2020: Funds received from 1073392 THE RAYNERS SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL TRUST
- 18 February 2021: Funds received from 1059707 THE WALTER HAZELL CHARITABLE AND EDUCATIONAL TRUST...
- 18 May 2023: Funds received from 300356 BUCKINGHAMSHIRE PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION
- 15 March 2024: Funds received from 1197464 HEALTHY LIVING CENTRE BUCKS
- 15 April 2024: Funds received from 202972 JOHN BEDFORD'S CHARITY
- 15 April 2024: Funds received from 202972 JOHN BEDFORD'S CHARITY
- 18 July 2024: Funds received from 286473 SOUTH BUCKS ASSOCIATION FOR THE DISABLED
- 02 August 2024: Funds received from 298663 THE FRIENDS OF SEELEYS HOUSE
- 25 November 2024: Funds received from 259921 THE WYKE (GERRARDS CROSS) LIMITED
- 17 February 2025: Funds received from 1198075 BUCKS BAME NETWORK
- HEART OF BUCKS (Working name)
- THE BUCKINGHAMSHIRE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Moir Stewart | Chair | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Jane Hobbs | Trustee | 15 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Vaughan | Trustee | 15 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
George Rupert Anson | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Annie Elinor Norfolk Beadle | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Jane Kirkbride | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Bradbury | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Annalise Smith | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Clare Wood | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Manktelow | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robert Taylor | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.09m | £2.06m | £2.52m | £3.39m | £3.46m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.04m | £1.98m | £1.85m | £2.90m | £2.77m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £30.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £410.29k | £410.29k | £1.25m | £957.77k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.51m | £1.62m | £2.05m | £4.39m | £3.19m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £217.12k | £329 | £207.03k | £274.28k | £234.65k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £121.15k | £1.63m | £352.63k | |
|
Income - Investment | £259.15k | £260.15k | £258.69k | £304.82k | £387.82k | |
|
Income - Other | £106.28k | £180.29k | £4.17k | £1.50k | £4.54k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £912.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £767.30k | £1.76m | £1.69m | £2.72m | £2.63m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £273.59k | £224.25k | £160.56k | £178.39k | £141.48k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £419.47k | £1.20m | £981.29k | £1.46m | £1.48m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £104.39k | £177.54k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £6.80k | £6.05k | £10.09k | £11.03k | £8.86k | |
|
Long-term investments | £6.26m | £8.64m | £9.11m | £9.53m | £12.11m | |
|
Other assets | £1.71m | £791.52k | £1.53m | £2.71m | £1.92m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £41.40k | £54.80k | £58.35k | £87.56k | £78.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 NOVEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28 OCTOBER 2008 NOW ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11 DECEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 JUN 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 APR 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S CHARITABLE PURPOSES (‘PURPOSES’ IN THIS DOCUMENT), ALSO IT’S OBJECTS FOR THE PURPOSES OF COMPANY LAW, ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO PROMOTE OR ADVANCE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COUNTY OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE OR OTHER SUCH REGIONS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS MAY BE BENEFITED BY A FUND MANAGED BY THE CHARITY, AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE FOREGOING): • THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY. • THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. • THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES. THIS INCLUDES THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF SICKNESS, DISEASE OR HUMAN SUFFERING. • THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP OR COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT. THIS CAN INCLUDE RURAL OR URBAN REGENERATION AND THE PROMOTION OF CIVIC RESPONSIBILITY, VOLUNTEERING, THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR OR THE EFFECTIVENESS OR EFFICIENCY OF CHARITIES. • THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS, CULTURE, HERITAGE OR SCIENCE. • THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT. THIS CAN INCLUDE SPORT OR GAMES WHICH PROMOTE HEALTH BY INVOLVING PHYSICAL OR MENTAL SKILL OR EXERTION. • THE ADVANCEMENT OF HUMAN RIGHTS, CONFLICT RESOLUTION OR RECONCILIATION OR THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS OR RACIAL HARMONY OR EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY. • THE ADVANCEMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION OR IMPROVEMENT. • THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE. THIS CAN INCLUDE RELIEF GIVEN BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION OR CARE TO THE RELEVANT PERSONS. • THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN, OR OF THE EFFICIENCY OF THE POLICE, FIRE AND RESCUE SERVICES OR AMBULANCE SERVICES.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE OR OTHER SUCH REGIONS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Heart Of Bucks
70 New Road
Weston Turville
AYLESBURY
Buckinghamshire
HP22 5QT
- Phone:
- 01296 330134
- Email:
- info@heartofbucks.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window