NORTHAMPTON AFRO-CARIBBEAN ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1075816
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing community spaces for: - Art, leisure and recreational activities; - 'drop in 'resource centre for the newly arrived communities; - places of worship for various religious organisations.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £6,600
Total expenditure: £7,440

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 June 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • NACO (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ULRIC EGERTON GRAVESANDE Chair
THE HENRY AND ELIZABETH LINEHAM FUND
Received: On time
SIR THOMAS WHITE'S NORTHAMPTON CHARITY
Received: On time
Jemma Moore Trustee 12 March 2018
None on record
Gabriel Kumah Trustee 23 August 1983
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.70k £3.60k £4.00k £5.69k £6.60k
Total expenditure £8.40k £8.90k £8.01k £9.37k £7.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 February 2025 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 February 2025 369 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 February 2022 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 February 2022 390 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
35 BEECH AVENUE
NORTHAMPTON
NN3 2HE
Phone:
01604716001