P. S. A. WELFARE AND BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Welfare, education and general charitable for the public good
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 May 2000: Standard registration
- STAGEHAND (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL JOHN LOWE | Chair | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Murray | Trustee | 20 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Lawrence | Trustee | 16 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Joseph JONES Mr. | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW LENTHALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.32k | £1.05m | £814.02k | £37.35k | £3.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.93k | £143.14k | £1.33m | £31.48k | £8.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £1.05m | £814.02k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £29 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £143.14k | £1.33m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £3.30k | £14.11k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 August 2024 | 280 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 August 2024 | 280 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 June 2024 | 581 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 June 2024 | 581 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 February 2022 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 February 2022 | 116 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN MEMBERS OF THE PRODUCTION SERVICES ASSOCIATION AND THE WIDOWS, WIDOWERS AND OTHER DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS. (2) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 5554
Bath
BA1 0BZ
- Phone:
- 07831499229
- Email:
- trustees@stagehand.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window