KINGFISHER CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Christian church providing practical and spiritual services to any and everyone who needs it.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £40,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gloucestershire
- India
- Malawi
- Mozambique
- Pakistan
- Panama
- Philippines
- Spain
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 06 December 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEAL PARKINSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Andrew Gatt | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Tullett | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paula Braham | Trustee | 18 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.54k | £170.55k | £185.11k | £166.52k | £228.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.87k | £128.23k | £159.11k | £168.14k | £213.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £40.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 February 2021 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 February 2021 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27 SEPTEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 8 NOVEMBER 1999 AND 15 MARCH 2007. as amended on 02 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND FOR ANY OTHER PURPOSES THAT ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES IS CHARITABLE WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR THE WORLD AND THAT THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION DEEM FIT. (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND HARDSHIP, WHO ARE SUFFERING DISTRESS IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT. (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE. THIS IS TO INCLUDE THE ESTABLISHMENT AND OPERATION OF EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kingfisher Church
Moor Street
GLOUCESTER
GL1 4NJ
- Phone:
- 01452 304339
- Email:
- info@kingfisher.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window