Trustees COLERNE VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1072699

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Palmer | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Glyn Thomas | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Morgan Youdan | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Williams | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Pike | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Skerrett | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Woods | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthena Mary Matthews | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Dawn Bicknell | Trustee | 30 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carol Ann Atkinson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE ELIZABETH NICHOLAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEILA MARGARET NICHOLAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ERICA DOROTHY LAWS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.