SAINT EDWARD'S MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in the London Borough of Havering in music
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Havering
Governance
- 05 February 1999: Standard registration
- S.E.M.S. (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN KING | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Venner | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Erik Eichelberger | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Morrisson | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Ruth Hobday | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.01k | £1.38k | £0 | £145 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.44k | £725 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 October 2024 | 271 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 October 2024 | 636 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 February 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 11TH JANUARY 1999 AS AMENDED 26TH JUNE 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HAVERING (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "THE BOROUGH") IN MUSIC
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF HAVERING
Contact information
- Address:
-
110 BEAULY WAY
ROMFORD
RM1 4XR
- Phone:
- 01708704085
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window