Accounts and annual returns 11TH FARNHAM SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1072910
Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 January 2025 362 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2025 727 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 February 2022 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 March 2021 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required