Financial history CONEYBERRY MILLENNIUM GREEN

Charity number: 1073176
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.61k £4.15k £2.63k £5.92k £6.00k
Total expenditure £5.19k £4.61k £3.96k £4.81k £4.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A