Financial history S T A RESCUE

Charity number: 1075974
Charity reporting is overdue by 1494 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2015 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019
Total gross income £13.94k £13.10k £13.55k £12.24k £7.53k
Total expenditure £17.43k £20.35k £17.53k £14.54k £12.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £1 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1 £0 N/A N/A