THE BANK YOUTH PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer youth club activities and a drop in youth information and advice service for young people aged 9 - 19 years on 4 nights per week, with sessions for different age groups within this range on different nights.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £960 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 13 April 1999: Standard registration
- BYP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Jane Sterling | Chair | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Barbara Dunball | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Rev Jenny Weigel | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joe Elston | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Gibbs | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Irens | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
PETER BREWER | Trustee |
|
||||||
ELAINE LOUISE BAKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.27k | £65.33k | £62.47k | £65.10k | £71.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.30k | £41.51k | £56.35k | £56.76k | £60.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.62k | N/A | £200 | £960 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 JANUARY 1998 AS AMENDED 11 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION, HEALTH ADVICE AND OTHER SUPPORT SERVICES TO ENABLE YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 10 AND 25, BUT PRIORITISING 13'S TO 19'S, TO: HAVE ACCESS TO APPROPRIATE SUPPORT AND LEARNING ENVIRONMENTS: REALISE THEIR CAPACITY TO BELIEVE IN AND FULFIL THEIR OWN POTENTIAL AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE IN ASHBURTON AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 East Street
Ashburton
NEWTON ABBOT
TQ13 7AA
- Phone:
- 01364653330
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window